Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matías José de Navia Bolaños y Moscoso, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1719BornLima, Peru
1742¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
26 Sep 175738.0AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
11 Dec 175738.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
2 Feb 176242.3DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matías José de Navia Bolaños y Moscoso:
Bishop Matías José de Navia Bolaños y Moscoso O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 76, Number 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016