Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso de Solís Marroquín y Gragera, O.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1716BornMiajadas
18 Jul 175740.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
24 Jul 175740.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
17 Feb 178366.4AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
8 Feb 179780.4DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alonso de Solís Marroquín y Gragera:
Bishop Alonso de Solís Marroquín y Gragera O.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 224, and Page 323
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 455
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 75, Number 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014