Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Ayestarán y Landa

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1738³BornVillafranca
7 Sep 177234.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
7 Sep 177234.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
29 Nov 177234.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
27 Jun 179657.8AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
8 Apr 180465.5DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Ayestarán y Landa
Bishop Agustín Ayestarán y Landa (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 90, Number 458
  • c4: CB, 25 Oct 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,960
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128, and Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016