Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás del Valle, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1686Born
17 Mar 172740.3AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
12 Feb 173144.2AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
Feb 1776³89.2DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás del Valle
Bishop Tomás del Valle O.P. (born , died Feb 1776) Bishop of Cádiz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 354
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 45, Number 178
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 68
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017