Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Salazar Góngora

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1677²BornMotril
5 May 173861.3AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
29 Jun 173861.4Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
21 Feb 174265.1DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Salazar Góngora:
Bishop Pedro Salazar Góngora (born 1677, died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,169
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 56, Number 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015