Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidro Alfonso Cavanillas

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702¹BornTalarrubias
9 Apr 175351.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
9 Apr 175351.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Anazarbus
25 Jul 175351.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anazarbus
12 May 175553.4AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
9 Nov 176664.9DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidro Alfonso Cavanillas:
Bishop Isidro Alfonso Cavanillas (died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 82, and Page 449
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 71, Number 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013