Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Pérez Rivera

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Titular Bishop of Gadara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1692Born
6 Mar 174148.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
6 Mar 174148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
6 May 174148.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
12 Nov 177179.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Pérez Rivera
Bishop Domingo Pérez Rivera (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,544
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 60, Number 272
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 72
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 222, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 29 Jan 2018