Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Javier Cardinal Delgado y Venegas

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1714Born
14 Apr 176146.3SelectedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
25 May 176146.4ConfirmedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
26 Jul 176146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
19 Dec 176854.0AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
20 May 177661.4AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
30 Mar 177863.2AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
1 Jun 177863.4Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 178166.9DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Delgado y Venegas
Francisco Javier Cardinal Delgado y Venegas (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva de Ariscal
Ordained BishopCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of Copacabana, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 78, Number 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 19
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,623

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast