Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Barcia Carrascal

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1702BornZamora
15 Jul 174340.7AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
26 Jul 174340.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
12 Jan 175653.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
22 Jun 177168.7DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín Barcia Carrascal:
Bishop Martín Barcia Carrascal (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 62, Number 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 183, and Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015