Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Cepeda Guerrero

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1668BornCádiz
19 Nov 173163.7AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
2 Mar 173264.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
24 Sep 174880.5DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Cepeda Guerrero:
Bishop Francisco Antonio Cepeda Guerrero (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,916
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,880
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 50, Number 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013