Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Innocenzo Gorgoni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Hemesa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1708BornGalatina
24 Mar 173122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 May 174638.0AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
8 May 174638.1Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
13 Feb 175546.8ResignedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
17 Feb 175546.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
176354.7AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
176455.7ResignedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
1 Sep 177466.4DiedPresident Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Gorgoni:
Archbishop Innocenzo Gorgoni O.S.B. (born , died ) President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013