Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele di Palma

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1689Born
24 Sep 171223.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 173747.6AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
12 May 173747.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
23 Mar 175565.5DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele di Palma
Archbishop Michele di Palma (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1751
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018