Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Cangiani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1693BornNapoli
19 Sep 171623.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 171724.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 174652.6AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
8 May 174652.7Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
26 Jan 177076.4ResignedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Cangiani:
Bishop Bernardo Cangiani (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Boiano

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762, Page 152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015