Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Alpheran de Bussan, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1684BornAix en Provence
23 Nov 171026.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
8 Dec 171026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
8 Mar 172843.3AppointedBishop of Malta
14 Mar 172843.3Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
19 Sep 174661.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
20 Apr 175772.4DiedBishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Paul Alpheran de Bussan:
Archbishop Paul Alpheran de Bussan O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 264
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015