Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Lancellotti-Birago

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1699BornLazate
21 Mar 172222.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 174646.8AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
19 Jun 174646.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
Nov 1765³66.2DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Lancellotti-Birago:
Bishop Gaspare Lancellotti-Birago (born , died Nov 1765) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764, Page 155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015