Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Cantoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1709³BornFaenza
19 Oct 173829.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Oct 173829.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 174233.3AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
23 Dec 174233.3Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
28 Sep 176758.1AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
2 Nov 178172.2DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cantoni:
Archbishop Antonio Cantoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 213, and Page 353
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 5 Dec 2015