Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guido Cardinal Calcagnini

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1725BornFerrara
30 Nov 176439.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 176439.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 176539.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
10 Feb 176539.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
20 May 177650.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
20 May 177650.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jul 177650.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
27 Aug 180781.9DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Calcagnini:
Guido Cardinal Calcagnini (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
  • a cardinal for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 May 1776

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015