Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Ginanni (Giannini)

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1726Born
18 Dec 175125.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 177548.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ravenna, Italy
17 Jul 177548.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
17 Sep 177549.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
15 Dec 177751.3AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
25 Mar 178558.6DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Ginanni (Giannini)
Bishop Gaetano Ginanni (Giannini) (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 70, and Page 220
  • b/c2: CB, 13 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,699
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018