Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Maria Cardinal Pirelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1708BornAriano, Italy
4 Feb 176556.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
10 Feb 176556.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
26 Sep 176658.4Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 176658.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
10 Jan 177162.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

MicroData Summary for Filippo Maria Pirelli:
Filippo Maria Cardinal Pirelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
  • a cardinal for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015