Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Liborio Pisani

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Lubrense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1698³BornNapoli
1 Apr 172425.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 174647.2AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
13 Mar 174647.2Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
Jul 1756³57.5DiedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Liborio Pisani:
Bishop Liborio Pisani (born , died Jul 1756) Bishop of Massa Lubrense

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015