Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giorgio Cardinal Doria

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1708BornGenoa, Italy
30 Nov 174032.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Dec 174032.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 174032.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
8 Dec 174032.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
9 Sep 174334.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 174435.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
15 Dec 174537.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
3 Jan 175748.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
31 Jan 175950.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Doria:
Giorgio Cardinal Doria (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

  • a priest for 18.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
  • a cardinal for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014