Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Joseph Artaud

Deceased

Bishop of Cavaillon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1707BornBoniliis
23 Sep 173023.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 175750.1AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
3 Apr 175750.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cavaillon, France
5 Sep 176053.5DiedBishop of Cavaillon, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Joseph Artaud:
Bishop Pierre-Joseph Artaud (died ) Bishop of Cavaillon

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 157
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013