Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Bortoli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Feltre

Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1695BornVenezia
24 Sep 171823.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 174752.4AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
21 Dec 174752.4Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
20 Mar 175761.7ResignedBishop of Feltre, Italy
28 Mar 175761.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
14 Mar 177680.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bortoli:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Bortoli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Feltre

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 213, and Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013