Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Puoti

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1716³BornArienso
14 Mar 173922.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 175842.5AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
26 Nov 175842.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
2 Nov 179276.5DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Puoti:
Archbishop Antonio Puoti (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015