Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adeodato Andrea Bivignano

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1693³BornArezzo
31 Jul 171825.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 175763.9AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
16 Jan 175764.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
1770¹76.9DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adeodato Andrea Bivignano:
Bishop Adeodato Andrea Bivignano (born , died 1770) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Nov 2015