Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Serafino Filangeri, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1713BornLapia
6 Apr 172916.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
31 Mar 173622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Nov 175845.6AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
26 Nov 175845.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
10 Jul 176249.2SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
23 Aug 176249.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
29 Jan 177662.8AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
14 Sep 178269.4DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Serafino Filangeri:
Archbishop Serafino Filangeri O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 64, and Page 304
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013