Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ugone Papé di Valdina

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1724Born
27 May 174722.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 177248.0SelectedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
14 Dec 177248.1ConfirmedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
24 Jan 177348.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
13 Jan 179166.2DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ugone Papé di Valdina
Bishop Ugone Papé di Valdina (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018