Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Scavo

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1705BornPalermo
20 Dec 172722.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 176661.5AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
7 Sep 176661.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
1 Dec 177166.8DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Scavo:
Bishop Michele Scavo (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013