Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Luca Garagnin

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1722BornTrau
30 Mar 174623.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 175633.9AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
30 May 175633.9Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
5 Jun 176542.9AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
20 Oct 178058.3DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Luca Garagnin:
Archbishop Giovanni Luca Garagnin (born , died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95, and Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015