Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Antonio Silverio Minucci

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1724BornSaravalle
7 May 174722.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 175732.7AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
3 Apr 175732.7Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
15 Dec 177753.4AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
20 Sep 177955.2AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
19 Apr 180378.8DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Antonio Silverio Minucci
Archbishop Andrea Antonio Silverio Minucci (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100, and Page 214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 216
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016