Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Amato

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1693BornNapoli
8 Dec 174047.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 175662.9SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
28 Mar 175763.6ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
10 Apr 175763.6Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
Dec 1765³72.2DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Amato:
Bishop Mariano Amato (born , died Dec 1765) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Nov 2015