Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Michael Vigil von Thun und Hohenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1724BornTrento
25 May 175530.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
29 May 177651.4SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
16 Sep 177651.7ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
30 Nov 177651.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
17 Jan 180075.0DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Peter Michael Vigil von Thun und Hohenstein:
Bishop Peter Michael Vigil von Thun und Hohenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015