Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Maria de Mari, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Savona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1700Born
17 Jun 172525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
15 Dec 175555.5AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
21 Dec 175555.5Ordained BishopBishop of Savona, Italy
27 Mar 177574.8DiedBishop of Savona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Maria de Mari
Bishop Ottavio Maria de Mari C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Savona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 367
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,755, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast