Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop NicolÚ Lercari

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1705BornTabia
11 Mar 173125.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 175348.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
26 Dec 175348.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
15 Mar 175751.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Lercari
Archbishop NicolÚ Lercari (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Rhodus

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1753, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016