Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Maria Cardinal Sacripante

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1689Born
30 Sep 173950.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Nov 173950.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
29 May 174151.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
15 May 174252.6Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
10 Apr 174757.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
Jan 1751²61.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 175161.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
12 Jan 175666.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
25 Jan 175666.3Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
4 Nov 175869.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Sacripante
Carlo Maria Cardinal Sacripante (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a priest for 7.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1739
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1756, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017