Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Alessandro Odoardi

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1690BornSant’Elpidio
2 Apr 171827.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Apr 171827.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 175867.7AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
21 Sep 175867.7Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
18 Jan 177584.0DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alessandro Odoardi:
Bishop Francesco Alessandro Odoardi (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015