Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vitaliano Cardinal Borromeo

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1720BornMilano, Italy
Dec 1747³27.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 175635.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
22 Feb 175635.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
16 Mar 175636.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
10 Dec 175939.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
26 Sep 176646.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 176848.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
Jul 1781³61.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
15 Dec 178363.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
7 Jun 179373.2DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vitaliano Borromeo:
Vitaliano Cardinal Borromeo (born , died ) Prefect of Ecclesiastical Immunity

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
  • a cardinal for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1756, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015