Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bellotti

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1709Born
19 Dec 173324.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 175747.2AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
6 Jan 175747.2Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
11 May 178878.5DiedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bellotti
Bishop Giuseppe Bellotti (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Lubrense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018