Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Colombani

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1717Born
30 Jul 174124.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 174730.3AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
26 Nov 174730.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
27 Mar 178870.7DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Colombani
Bishop Francesco Maria Colombani (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForli

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1779
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 130
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018