Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Apollinare Peruzzini, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1708BornFossombrone
24 Aug 173123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
17 Mar 175546.6AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
31 Mar 175546.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
25 Jan 177465.5DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Apollinare Peruzzini:
Bishop Apollinare Peruzzini O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1766
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34/d: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014