Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph de Guyon de Crochans

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1674BornAvignon
14 Jul 170935.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Aug 170935.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 170935.4AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
23 Jun 171036.2InstalledBishop of Cavaillon, France
30 Jul 174268.3AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
17 Dec 174268.7InstalledArchbishop of Avignon, France
22 Sep 175682.5DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph de Guyon de Crochans:
Archbishop Joseph de Guyon de Crochans (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a priest for 47.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 152
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015