Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Maria Mariotti

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1700BornVolpajola
15 Jun 172625.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 174140.7AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
4 Jun 174140.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
26 Jun 175150.8DiedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France

MicroData Summary for Paulo Maria Mariotti:
Bishop Paulo Maria Mariotti (born , died ) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013