Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyacinthe Le Blanc, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1696Born
12 Apr 172831.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
18 Apr 172831.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
26 Apr 175558.9DiedTitular Bishop of Ioppe

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthe Le Blanc
Bishop Hyacinthe Le Blanc O.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Ioppe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix en Provence

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 229
  • bp/bd/c34/d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,728, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast