Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Melchior Cardinal de Polignac

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1661BornLavoûte-Sur-Loire
18 May 171250.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Jan 171351.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 Sep 172463.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
30 Nov 172463.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
Dec 172564.1SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
19 Dec 172564.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
20 Feb 172664.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
19 Mar 172664.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Auch, France
20 Nov 174180.1DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Melchior de Polignac:
Cardinal Melchior de Polignac (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
  • a cardinal for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013