Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie de Suarès d’Aulan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1696BornAvignon
29 Mar 172124.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 173639.7SelectedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
6 May 173740.4ConfirmedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
2 Jun 173740.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
23 Jan 177275.1ResignedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
11 Apr 178588.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax), France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie de Suarès d’Aulan:
Bishop Louis-Marie de Suarès d’Aulan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acqs (Dax)

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013