Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

Archidioecesis Auxitanus (-Condomiensis-Lectoriensis-Lomberiensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Maurice Marcel Gardès, Archbishop
  • Maurice Lucien Fréchard, C.S.Sp., Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Auch
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Auch (erected)
Archdiocese of Auch
879ElevatedDiocese of Auch Archdiocese of Auch
29 November 1801SuppressedArchdiocese of Auch (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
Archdiocese of Auch
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Agen Archdiocese of Auch
Archdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)
29 June 1908UnitedArchdiocese of Auch Archdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)
8 December 2002ElevatedArchdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez) (no longer a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)
1948189,350191,45598.9%3221633856016200507ap1951
1959180,000185,11197.2%2741629062010370507ap1960
1970180,000181,57799.1%2068214841118350507ap1971
1980170,400177,60095.9%166517199612507ap1981
1990173,000181,10095.5%13941431,209311235507ap1991
1999153,000174,00087.9%11051151,330519212507ap2000
2000153,000174,42187.7%10951141,342514206507ap2001
2001152,500172,33588.5%11041141,33759196507ap2002
2002152,500172,33588.5%10731101,3867718726ap2003
2003152,500172,33588.5%10611071,4257518226ap2004
2004152,500172,33588.5%10311041,4667517526ap2005
2006154,000173,70088.7%972991,5557617626ap2007
2012167,745192,56187.1%822841,9967413726ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013