Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François Guillaume Cardinal de Castelnau de Clermont-Ludève

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Bishop of Agde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480BornClermont- Lodève
17 Nov 150121.9AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
22 Jun 150222.5AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
29 Nov 150323.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 150323.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
4 Jul 150727.5AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
150828.0AppointedBishop of Senez, France
2 May 150929.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
19 Sep 150929.7ResignedBishop of Senez, France
17 Mar 151131.2ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
9 Jul 151131.5AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
28 Jul 151434.6ResignedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
11 Jan 152343.0AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
18 Dec 152344.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
10 May 153151.4AppointedBishop of Agde, France
20 Nov 153454.9AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
14 Jun 153858.5ResignedArchbishop of Auch, France
24 Mar 153959.2ResignedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
13 Mar 154161.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for François Guillaume de Castelnau de Clermont-Ludève:
Cardinal François Guillaume de Castelnau de Clermont-Ludève (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a cardinal for 37.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1503

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013