Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude-Marc-Antoine d’Apchon de Corgenon

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1721BornMontbrison
174725.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jun 175534.0SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
24 Sep 175534.3ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
19 Oct 175534.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
18 Feb 177654.7SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
12 Apr 177654.8ResignedBishop of Dijon, France
20 May 177654.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
21 May 178361.9DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Marc-Antoine d’Apchon de Corgenon:
Archbishop Claude-Marc-Antoine d’Apchon de Corgenon (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 110, and Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015