Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Frédéric-Jérôme Cardinal de La Rochefoucauld

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1701BornVersailles
22 Jan 172927.5SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
6 Jul 172928.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
7 Aug 172928.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
10 Apr 174745.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 174745.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
29 Apr 175755.8DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Frédéric-Jérôme de La Rochefoucauld:
Cardinal Frédéric-Jérôme de La Rochefoucauld (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013