Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

Dioecesis Bellovacensis (-Noviomensis-Silvanectensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 12 April 1851
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Reims
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,855 (2,261 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nord
  • Official Web Site: http://catho60.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 15 rue Jeanne Hachette, B.P. 20636, 60026 Beauvais CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 3.44.06.28.23
  • Fax: 3.44.06.34.42

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Beauvais
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Beauvais (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Beauvais (suppressed) Diocese of Amiens
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Senlis (suppressed) Diocese of Beauvais
Diocese of Beauvais
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Amiens Diocese of Beauvais
Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)
12 April 1851Name ChangedDiocese of Beauvais
Diocese of Noyon
Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)
1948394,500396,72499.4%361153761,04960572551ap1951
1959435,000450,00096.7%37093463939208580710ap1960
1970540,998.0%32749376072545712ap1971
1980475,000620,45076.6%244382821,684559490709ap1981
1990583,000712,00081.9%192632552,28612100394706ap1991
1999698,000780,00089.5%141151564,474185027545ap2000
2000685,000765,01189.5%117151325,189184527545ap2001
2001700,000765,01191.5%182131953,589194426145ap2002
2002710,000766,44192.6%152281803,944215724745ap2003
2003690,000766,44190.0%136281644,207195423845ap2004
2004685,000766,44189.4%123311544,448194521545ap2005
2006690,000779,91688.5%120171375,036224119445ap2007
2012714,000804,10088.8%123301534,666274020045ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013